CA AB1951 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-01 - Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21080.44 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: exemption: roadside wildfire prevention projects.
Sponsors
Asm. Vince Fong [R] | Asm. Megan Dahle [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2024-01-30 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 29. |
2024-01-29 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21080.44 | New Code | See Bill Text |