CA AB1961 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-28 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6141 of the Penal Code, relating to prisons.
Title
California Rehabilitation Oversight Board: reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-23 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2010-04-14 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-03-24 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. Re-referred. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (March 23). | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |
2010-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2010-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |