CA AB2008 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-23 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-09-23 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 19852.4 to the Government Code, relating to public employment.
Title
Public employment: furloughs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-08-23 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2008 Arambula By Correa (Y: 28 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2008 ARAMBULA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-15 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-23 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-02 - Assembly - AB 2008 ARAMBULA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-23 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2010-09-02 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 3:45 p.m. | |
2010-08-23 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2010-08-23 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 4797.) | |
2010-08-02 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-07-15 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 15). | |
2010-06-24 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 23). | |
2010-06-10 | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. | |
2010-06-03 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-06-02 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 21. Page 5511.) | |
2010-06-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-05-28 | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. | |
2010-05-05 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2010-04-21 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (April 21). | |
2010-03-04 | Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. | |
2010-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2010-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |