CA AB2008 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-25 - In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 42238 and 42238.485 of, and to add and repeal Section 42241.2 of, the Education Code, relating to education finance.
Title
Education finance: revenue limits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-25 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |
2012-04-25 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-03-29 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-03-15 | Re-referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-03-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2012-02-24 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. | |
2012-02-23 | Read first time. To print. |