CA AB2008 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 88, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 88, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 65460.2 of the Government Code, relating to local planning.
Title
Transit village plans: goods movement.
Sponsors
Asm. Bill Quirk [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-06-26 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2008 Quirk (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2008 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Assembly - AB 2008 QUIRK Assembly Third Reading (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 88, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-07-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:15 p.m. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4141.). |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 17). |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 0. Page 5003.) |
2014-05-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-12 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2014-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2014-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65460.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 21094.5.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |