CA AB2008 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Coauthors revised.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-02 - Coauthors revised.
Pending: Assembly Utilities and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 7.10 (commencing with Section 25698) to Division 15 of the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.
Title
Reliable Energy Needs for Everyone in the West Program.
Sponsors
Asm. Greg Wallis [R] | Asm. Juan Alanis [R] | Asm. Diane Dixon [R] | Asm. James Gallagher [R] |
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Sen. Rosilicie Ochoa Bogh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-03-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2024-03-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2024-02-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES. |
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 2. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25698 | New Code | See Bill Text |