CA AB2159 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 132, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 132, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 351.2 to the Evidence Code, relating to evidence.
Title
Evidence: immigration status.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2159 Gonzalez By Hall (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - AB 2159 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - AB 2159 GONZALEZ Assembly Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 132, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-08-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 4726.). |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 14). |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 53. Noes 20. Page 4229.) |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2016-03-30 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (March 29). |
2016-02-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 19. |
2016-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Evidence Code | 351.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |