CA AB2204 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 19 (commencing with Section 25996.5) to Division 15 of the Public Resources Code, relating to green hydrogen.
Title
Green hydrogen.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | (Pending re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES.) |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4775.) |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on U. & E. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on U. & E. and NAT. RES. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2024-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25996.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |