CA AB2234 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 823, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 823, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 21214.7 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: electric bicycles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-22 - Assembly - AB 2234 Boerner Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]
2024-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2234 Boerner et al. By Padilla (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2234 Boerner Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2234 Boerner et al. By Padilla (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - AB 2234 Boerner Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2024-05-15 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 823, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-08-28 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 57. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.). |
2024-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-06-17 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-06-17 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2024-06-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2024-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0.) |
2024-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (May 15). |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-01 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-02-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-02-09 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2024-02-08 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 21214.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |