CA AB2272 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 99, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-13 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 99, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 798.88 of the Civil Code, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 85 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to mobilehomes.
Title
Mobilehomes: injunctions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2272 Wagner (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2272 WAGNER Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Housing and Community Development to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-17 - Assembly - AB 2272 WAGNER Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Housing and Community Development to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-13 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 99, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-07-13 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-07-05 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2012-06-28 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |
2012-06-28 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4181.). | |
2012-06-21 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-06-20 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). | |
2012-05-24 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-05-17 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-17 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4887.) | |
2012-05-10 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2012-05-09 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (May 9). | |
2012-04-24 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | |
2012-04-23 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-04-19 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-04-09 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-03-29 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-03-22 | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |
2012-03-19 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. | |
2012-02-27 | Read first time. | |
2012-02-26 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |
2012-02-24 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 85 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 798.88 | Amended Code | Citation Text |