CA AB2320 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 902, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 902, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 84307.5 of the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: campaign funds.
Sponsors
Asm. Paul Fong [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-20 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2320 Fong By Jackson (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 2320 FONG Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-24 - Assembly - AB 2320 FONG Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-01 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 902, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-03 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2014-08-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 4659.). |
2014-07-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-06-30 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4600.) |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2014-04-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 84307.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |