CA AB2398 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Vetoed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 42001.19 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: pedestrians and bicyclists.
Sponsors
Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-25 - Assembly - AB 2398 LEVINE Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 75 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2398 Levine By Evans (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2398 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-08-21 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2398 Levine By Evans (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Assembly - AB 2398 LEVINE Assembly Third Reading (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2014-09-05 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 3. Page 6388.). |
2014-08-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 23 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2014-08-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 3. Page 4703.). |
2014-08-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2014-08-04 | Senate | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 17). |
2014-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and PUB. S. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2014-05-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 2. Page 5273.) |
2014-05-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (May 23). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-04-30 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 12810.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 13355 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 21071 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 42001.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 42001.21 | New Code | See Bill Text |