CA AB248 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 17053.90 of, and to repeal and amend Sections 17053.80 and 23623 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income taxes: credit: qualified medical services
Sponsors
Asm. Henry Perea [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-01-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2012-01-19 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission. | |
2012-01-12 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-01-11 | Read second time and amended. | |
2012-01-10 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (January 9). | |
2012-01-09 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |
2012-01-04 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |
2011-06-14 | Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2011-06-13 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-03-29 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-16 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-02-18 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2011-02-04 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. | |
2011-02-03 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 93000 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.90 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23623 | Amended Code | Citation Text |