CA AB2482 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-23 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 70901.3 to the Education Code, relating to community colleges.
Title
Board of Governors of the California Community Colleges:
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-13 - Assembly - AB 2482 FURUTANI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-23 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-05-27 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |
2010-05-13 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-13 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5132.) | |
2010-05-03 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-29 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (April 28). | |
2010-04-21 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 20). | |
2010-04-06 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2010-03-11 | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. | |
2010-02-22 | Read first time. | |
2010-02-21 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. | |
2010-02-19 | Introduced. To print. |