CA AB2574 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-28 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 132400 and 132450 of the Public Utilities Code, relating to the Metro Gold Line Foothill Extension Construction Authority.
Title
Metro Gold Line Foothill Extension Construction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-07 - Assembly - Be referred to Committee on Transportation (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-28 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-24 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4575.) (pending re-referral to the Com. on L. GOV.) |
2014-04-21 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-04-07 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2014-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2014-03-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2014-03-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. |
2014-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2014-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 132400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 132450 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 9600.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |