CA AB2579 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 835, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 835, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 17973 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to business and professions.
Title
Inspections: exterior elevated elements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-22 - Assembly - AB 2579 Quirk-Silva Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2024-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2579 Quirk-Silva By Menjivar (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Assembly - AB 2579 Quirk-Silva Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-08-19 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB2579 Quirk-Silva By Menjivar (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-07-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Business, Professions and Economic Development] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Assembly - AB 2579 Quirk-Silva Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 835, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-08-28 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 0.). |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2024-08-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0.). |
2024-07-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2024-06-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-06-25 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & E. D. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 24). |
2024-06-24 | Senate | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 30. Noes 6. Page 4666.) |
2024-05-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and B., P. & E. D. |
2024-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5091.) |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2024-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 17973 | Amended Code | Citation Text |