CA AB2823 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6254.26 of the Government Code, relating to public records.
Title
Public records.
Sponsors
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 0 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2823 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-31 - Assembly - AB 2823 GATTO Assembly Third Reading (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2016-06-27 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2016-06-22 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Re-referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2016-06-20 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 1. Page 5045.) |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-05-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2016-04-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2016-03-31 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on E. & R. Read second time and amended. |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2016-02-22 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2016-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2016-02-19 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 6254.26 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 82033 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 82034 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 87103 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 87206 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 87206.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 87207 | Amended Code | Citation Text |