CA AB2894 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-11 - In committee: Held under submission.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 7125.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to contractors.
Title
Contractors: workers’ compensation insurance.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Cooper [D] | Asm. Megan Dahle [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2894 Cooper Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-25 - Assembly - AB 2894 Cooper Assembly Third Reading (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Insurance] (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-11 | Senate | In committee: Held under submission. |
2022-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Referred to suspense file. |
2022-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-06-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 5025.) |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 2.) (May 4). |
2022-05-04 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on INS. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & P. and INS. |
2022-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2022-02-18 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 7125.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |