CA AB2912 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 209, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 209, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5654 of the Fish and Game Code, and to amend Sections 8670.3, 8670.25.5, 8670.27, 8670.29, 8670.31, 8670.37.58, 8670.54, 8670.56.5, 8670.56.6, and 8670.59 of the Government Code, relating to oil spills.
Title
Oil spills.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-08-15 - Assembly - AB 2912 NAT. RES. Concurrence in Senate Amendments By WILLIAMS (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2912 Committee On NAT. RES. (Williams) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2912 NAT. RES. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB2912 Committee On NAT. RES. (Williams) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-12 - Assembly - AB 2912 NAT. RES. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-26 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 209, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-26 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5818.). |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4875.). |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-29 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2016-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 4791.) |
2016-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 4). |
2016-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-03-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 15. |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 5654 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8670.25.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8670.27 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8670.29 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8670.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8670.31 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8670.37.58 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8670.54 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8670.56.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8670.56.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8670.59 | Amended Code | Citation Text |