CA AB3026 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4062 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Pharmacy.
Sponsors
Asm. Diane Dixon [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4062 | Amended Code | Citation Text |