CA AB3053 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Assembly Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4501 of the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to fairs.
Title
State-supported fairs: exhibits: regulations.
Sponsors
Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2024-04-17 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on AGRI. Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-10 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 4501 | Amended Code | Citation Text |