CA AB3074 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 259, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 259, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 51182, 51186, and 51189 of the Government Code, and to amend Section 4291 of the Public Resources Code, relating to fire prevention.
Title
Fire prevention: wildfire risk: defensible space: ember-resistant zones.
Sponsors
Asm. Laura Friedman [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D] | Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] |
Asm. Robert Rivas [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - AB 3074 Friedman Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3074 Friedman et al. By Jackson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 3074 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB3074 Friedman et al. By Jackson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Assembly - AB 3074 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 259, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-15 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 5432.). |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0.). |
2020-08-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2020-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-08-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-07 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-08-05 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-02 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-07-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2020-06-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4776.) |
2020-06-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 3). |
2020-06-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2020-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 51182 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51186 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51189 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 4291 | Amended Code | Citation Text |