US HB8663 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 10 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-09-10 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Science and Technology Directorate in the Department of Homeland Security to develop greater capacity to detect, identify, and disrupt illicit substances in very low concentrations.
Title
DETECT Fentanyl and Xylazine Act of 2024 Detection Equipment and Technology Evaluation to Counter the Threat of Fentanyl and Xylazine Act of 2024
Sponsors
Rep. Nick LaLota [R-NY] | Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA] | Rep. Donald Davis [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2024-09-09 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-09-09 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5064) |
2024-09-09 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 8663. |
2024-09-09 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5064-5065) |
2024-09-09 | House | Mr. Gimenez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2024-08-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 531. |
2024-08-23 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 118-634. |
2024-06-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2024-06-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2024-06-12 | House | Subcommittee on Emergency Management and Technology Discharged |
2024-06-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Management and Technology. |
2024-06-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2024-06-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB4419 (Related) 2024-09-18 - Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.