CA AB3119 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-02 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 2191.6, 2454.6, 2836.5, and 3524.7 to the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Physicians and surgeons, nurse practitioners, and physician assistants: continuing medical education: infection-associated chronic conditions.
Sponsors
Asm. Evan Low [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-06-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Assembly - AB 3119 Low Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-02 - Assembly - AB 3119 Low Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2024-06-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-10 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2024-05-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2024-05-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0.) |
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2024-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-03-19 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2024-02-17 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 2191.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2454.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 2836.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 3524.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |