MO SB736 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - S Bills with H Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-17 - S Bills with H Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the State Treasurer
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the State Treasurer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-17 | House | S Bills with H Amendments |
2024-05-14 | House | H Third Read and Passed |
2024-05-14 | House | HCS, as amended, H adopted |
2024-05-14 | House | HA 5 to HCS H offered & adopted (Veit)--(3120H06.04H) |
2024-05-14 | House | HA 4 to HCS H offered & adopted (Black)--(3120H06.09H) |
2024-05-14 | House | HA 3 to HCS, as amended, H adopted --(3120H06.13H) |
2024-05-14 | House | HA 1 to HA 3 to HCS H offered & adopted (Knight)--(3120H06.20H) |
2024-05-14 | House | HA 3 to HCS H offered (Reedy)--(3120H06.13H) |
2024-05-14 | House | HA 2 to HCS H offered & adopted (O'Donnell)--(3120H06.01H) |
2024-05-14 | House | HA 1 to HCS H offered & adopted (Reedy)--(3120H06.12H) |
2024-05-13 | House | Bill Placed on H Informal Calendar SBs for Third Reading |
2024-05-13 | House | Reported Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2024-05-13 | House | Voted Do Pass H Fiscal Review |
2024-05-10 | House | Referred H Fiscal Review |
2024-05-10 | House | Reported Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2024-05-10 | House | Voted Do Pass H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2024-05-09 | House | Referred H Rules - Legislative Oversight |
2024-05-09 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass H Financial Institutions |
2024-04-23 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass H Financial Institutions |
2024-04-02 | House | Hearing Conducted H Financial Institutions |
2024-03-28 | House | Referred H Financial Institutions |
2024-03-11 | House | H Second Read |
2024-03-07 | House | H First Read |
2024-03-07 | Senate | S Third Read and Passed |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported from S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-03-04 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Referred S Fiscal Oversight Committee |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Reported Truly Perfected S Rules, Joint Rules, Resolutions and Ethics Committee |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Perfected, as amended |
2024-02-27 | Senate | SA 3 S offered & adopted (Brattin)--(3120S01.04S) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | SA 2 S offered & withdrawn (Brattin)--(3120S01.02S) |
2024-02-27 | Senate | SA 1 S offered & adopted (Eigel)--(3120S01.01S) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported from S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Voted Do Pass S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Hearing Conducted S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Second Read and Referred S Insurance and Banking Committee |
2024-01-03 | Senate | S First Read |
2023-12-01 | Senate | Prefiled |