CA AB3280 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-05 - Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2392 of the Streets and Highways Code, relating to transportation.
Title
The Solutions for Congested Corridors Program: regional transportation planning agency.
Sponsors
Asm. Kansen Chu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-05 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-05-04 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2020-04-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2020-02-24 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2020-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2020-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Streets and Highways Code | 2392 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3280 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200AB3280 |