CA AB437 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-15 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-15 - Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17052.12 and 23609 of, to add Sections 17131.8 and 24304 to, and to add and repeal Division 3 (commencing with Section 70000) of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to small businesses, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Research and Development: Small Business Grant Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-02 - Assembly - AB 437 ATKINS Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB437 Atkins By Hertzberg (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 437 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB437 Atkins By Hertzberg (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-02 - Assembly - AB 437 ATKINS Assembly Third Reading (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-15 | Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file. | |
2015-10-10 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2015-09-14 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 2795.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2801.). |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 3 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 2349.). |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 27). |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 8). |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 1777.) |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 27). |
2015-04-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2015-04-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2015-02-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. |
2015-02-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17052.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17131.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23609 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 24304 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 70000 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |