CA AB440 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-07-01 - From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 1).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to elections, and calling elections, to take effect immediately.
Title
Ballot measures.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-07-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 440 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-25 - Assembly - AB 440 Wicks Assembly Third Reading (Y: 62 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 1). |
2024-07-01 | Senate | Joint Rules 10.5 and 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 8.) |
2024-06-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2024-06-27 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2023-09-06 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Wiener. |
2023-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (June 20). |
2023-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 62. Noes 13. Page 1737.) |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (May 3). |
2023-04-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 12). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2023-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV. |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 9. |
2023-02-06 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65915 | Amended Code | Citation Text |