CA AB501 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Pending: Assembly Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 39719 of, and to add Section 39719.4 to, the Health and Safety Code, relating to high-speed rail, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Greenhouse Gas Reduction Fund: High-Speed Rail Authority: rural road safety: transfer and loan.
Sponsors
Asm. Vince Fong [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. |
2024-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-04-13 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-02-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 10. |
2023-02-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39719 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39719.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |