CA AB62 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 73, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-08-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 73, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 27602 of the Vehicle Code, relating to vehicles.
Title
Vehicles: television broadcast or video signal displays.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-22 - Senate - Special Consent #9 AB62 Portantino (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-27 - Assembly - AB 62 PORTANTINO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2009-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2009-06-09 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-04-27 - Assembly - AB 62 PORTANTINO Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2009-04-20 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 73, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-08-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2009-07-30 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 1 p.m. | |
2009-07-01 | Withdrawn from Governor. Ordered returned to enrollment. | |
2009-06-25 | Enrolled and to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. | |
2009-06-22 | In Assembly. To enrollment. | |
2009-06-22 | Read third time, passed, and to Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1377.) | |
2009-06-16 | Ordered to Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-06-11 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-10 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 9). | |
2009-05-14 | Referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2009-04-27 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2009-04-27 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1108.) | |
2009-04-22 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |
2009-04-21 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (April 20). | |
2009-03-27 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |
2008-12-16 | Read first time. | |
2008-12-10 | From printer. May be heard in committee January 9. | |
2008-12-09 | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 27602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |