CA AB755 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 542, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 542, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 3.8 (commencing with Section 390) to Division 1 of the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Water: public entity: water usage demand analysis.
Sponsors
Asm. Diane Papan [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-12 - Assembly - AB 755 Papan Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 60 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB755 Papan By Ashby (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 755 Papan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB755 Papan By Ashby (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-07-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 755 Papan Assembly Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 542, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-19 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 60. Noes 18. Page 3237.). |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3228.) |
2023-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 13 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 2549.). |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-21 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-08-14 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-08-09 | Senate | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 10). |
2023-07-03 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 58. Noes 17. Page 2032.) |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 1585.) |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 3.) (May 10). |
2023-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Water Code | 390 | New Code | See Bill Text |