CA AB773 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 664, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 664, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 13307.7 of, and to add Section 9611 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Elections: filings.
Sponsors
Asm. Gail Pellerin [D] | Asm. Damon Connolly [D] | Sen. Dave Cortese [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Asm. Tom Lackey [R] | Sen. John Laird [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] |
Sen. Monique Limon [D] | Asm. Blanca Pacheco [D] | Asm. Robert Rivas [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-09-07 - Assembly - AB 773 Pellerin Concurrence - Urgency Added (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB773 Pellerin et al. By Limón Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Assembly - AB 773 Pellerin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-05 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB773 Pellerin et al. By Limón Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Assembly - AB 773 Pellerin Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 664, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-14 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3022.). |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 7 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2373.). |
2023-08-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-08-21 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-06-27 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2023-05-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1485.) |
2023-04-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (April 26). |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2023-02-14 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 16. |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 13307.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 9611 | New Code | See Bill Text |