CA AB805 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 180, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 180, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 5 (commencing with Section 4000) to Division 4 of, and to repeal Title 6 (commencing with Section 1350) of Part 4 of Division 2 of, the Civil Code, relating to common interest developments.
Title
Common interest developments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-06 - Assembly - AB 805 TORRES Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Special Consent #14 AB805 Torres (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - AB 805 TORRES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Special Consent #14 AB805 Torres (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-02 - Assembly - AB 805 TORRES Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-17 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 180, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-08-17 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-08-10 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:45 p.m. | |
2012-08-06 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5756.). | |
2012-07-02 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 4 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. | |
2012-07-02 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4223.). | |
2012-06-27 | Ordered to special consent calendar. | |
2012-06-21 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-06-20 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). | |
2012-06-11 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-01-11 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (January 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2012-01-04 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2011-05-12 | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and JUD. | |
2011-05-02 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-02 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1178.) | |
2011-04-27 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-04-26 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). | |
2011-04-06 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. | |
2011-02-18 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1350 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 4000 | New Code | See Bill Text |