CA AB805 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11546.7 to the Government Code, relating to information technology.
Title
Director of Technology: procurement: training program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Accountability and Administrative Review (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Accountability and Administrative Review (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2016-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Article IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1613.) In committee: Held under submission. |
2015-05-27 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-04-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2015-04-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 7). |
2015-03-12 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and A. & A.R. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 29. |
2015-02-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 11546.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |