CA AB805 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 658, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 658, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 120050.2, 120051.6, 120102.5, 125102, 132351.1, 132351.2, 132351.4, 132352.3, 132354.1, 132360.1, and 132362 of, to add Sections 120221.5, 125222.5, and 132354.7 to, to add Article 11 (commencing with Section 120480) to Chapter 4 of Division 11 of, to add Article 9 (commencing with Section 125480) to Chapter 4 of Division 11.5 of, and to repeal Sections 120050.5 and 120051.1 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation.
Title
County of San Diego: transportation agencies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-11 - Assembly - AB 805 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 46 N: 28 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB805 Gonzalez Fletcher By Atkins (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 805 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-07 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB805 Gonzalez Fletcher By Atkins (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-28 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation and Housing] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Assembly - AB 805 GONZALEZ FLETCHER Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 25 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Transportation] (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 658, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-19 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 46. Noes 28. Page 3133.). |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 9 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 2559.). |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2017-08-28 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-07-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-12 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (July 11). |
2017-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 5). Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and T. & H. |
2017-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2017-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 1963.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 52. Noes 24. Page 1776.) |
2017-05-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 26). |
2017-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 5. Noes 4.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-04-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS. |
2017-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2017-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |