CA AB824 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 531, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on October 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 531, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 114.01 (commencing with Section 134000) to the Health and Safety Code, relating to business.
Title
Business: preserving access to affordable drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 824 Wood Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB824 Wood et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 824 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB824 Wood et al. By Hertzberg (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-24 - Assembly - AB 824 Wood Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 24 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 531, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 64. Noes 1. Page 3508.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2816.). |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-10 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 9). |
2019-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 0. Page 1978.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (May 16). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2019-03-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 26). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-03-04 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 23. |
2019-02-20 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 134000 | New Code | See Bill Text |