CA ACR222 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 194, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 194, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Historically Black Colleges and Universities Week.
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-22 - Senate - Special Consent ACR222 Weber (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-08-12 - Assembly - ACR 222 Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-12 - Assembly - ACR 222 Weber Assembly Third Reading (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-08-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-08-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 194, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-08-28 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |
2024-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2024-08-22 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0.) |
2024-08-20 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2024-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-12 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2024-08-12 | Assembly | Adopted and to Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.) |
2024-08-05 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to Third Reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 5). |
2024-08-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2024-07-03 | Assembly | From printer. |
2024-07-02 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |