CA AJR40 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 57-0)
Status: Passed on September 9 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the federal poverty level measurement.
Title
Federal poverty level measurement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-20 - Assembly - AJR 40 MULLIN Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 55 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR40 Mullin By Mitchell (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - AJR 40 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-18 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AJR40 Mullin By Mitchell (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-05 - Assembly - AJR 40 MULLIN Assembly Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-04-08 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-09 | Assembly | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Res. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2014. |
2014-09-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:15 p.m. |
2014-08-20 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 6215.). |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Adopted and to Assembly. (Ayes 26. Noes 10. Page 4557.) |
2014-08-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | In Senate. To Com. on RLS. |
2014-05-05 | Assembly | Amended, adopted, and to Senate. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 4747.) |
2014-04-10 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 8). |
2014-03-25 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing cancelled at the request of author. |
2014-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2014-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. |
2014-02-21 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |