CA SB1031 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - April 23 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 4788.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Public Employees and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - April 23 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 4788.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Senate Public Employees and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 7522.45 to the Government Code, relating to public employees’ retirement.
Title
Public employees’ retirement: cost-of-living adjustments: prohibitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [04-23-2018]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | April 23 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 4788.) Reconsideration granted. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2018-02-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11. |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7522.45 | New Code | See Bill Text |