CA SB1087 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-16 - May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 39619.9 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 3118 to the Public Resources Code, relating to oil imports.
Title
Oil imports: air quality emissions data.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-22 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Energy, Utilities and Communications] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0. Page 3700.) (April 22). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E., U. & C. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3379.) (March 20). Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing March 20. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on E.Q. and E., U. & C. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 14. |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39619.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 3118 | New Code | See Bill Text |