CA SB1275 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 16 (commencing with Section 69820) to Chapter 2 of Part 42 of Division 5 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Public postsecondary education: Plan Against College Hunger Act of 2018.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-25 | Senate | May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | April 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4533.) (April 4). |
2018-04-02 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 69820 | New Code | See Bill Text |