CA SB1348 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 174, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 174, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 114.5 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations.
Title
Licensure applications: military experience.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-04 - Assembly - SB 1348 Cannella Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Special Consent # SB1348 Cannella (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations to Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-02 - Senate - Special Consent # SB1348 Cannella (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 174, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2016-08-04 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5720.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29). |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4149.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4008.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3492.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 114.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |