CA SB1360 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-23 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-23 - Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12804.9 of the Vehicle Code, relating to driver’s licenses.
Title
Driver’s license: driving test: foreign nationals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1360 Portantino (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1360 Portantino (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 16). |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-05-25 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 3. Page 5086.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4970.) (May 7). |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 4823.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 12804.16 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 12804.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |