CA SB1365 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add the heading of Article 1 (commencing with Section 14025) and the heading of Article 2 (commencing with Section 14027) to, and to add Article 3 (commencing with Section 14040) to, Chapter 1.5 of Division 14 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
California Voting Rights Act of 2001.
Sponsors
Sen. Alex Padilla [D] | Asm. Luis Alejo [D] | Asm. Paul Fong [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1365 Padilla Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1365 Padilla Senate Third Reading By PEREZ, J (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1365 Padilla (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-11 - Assembly - SB 1365 Padilla Senate Third Reading By PEREZ, J (Y: 54 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-06-24 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1365 Padilla (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2014-09-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2014-08-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2014-08-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4475.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 24. Page 5966.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 5907.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-07-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 24). |
2014-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-06-10 | Assembly | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2014-05-15 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 3269.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 3234.) (April 22). |
2014-04-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read first time. |
2014-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 14025 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Elections Code | 14027 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 14029 | Amended Code | Citation Text |