CA SB1383 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 395, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on September 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 395, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 39730.5, 39730.6, 39730.7, and 39730.8 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Chapter 13.1 (commencing with Section 42652) to Part 3 of Division 30 of the Public Resources Code, relating to methane emissions.
Title
Short-lived climate pollutants: methane emissions: dairy and livestock: organic waste: landfills.
Sponsors
Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] | Asm. Das Williams [D] | Sen. Benjamin Allen [D] | Sen. Loni Hancock [D] |
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-31 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB1383 Lara (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1383 Lara Senate Third Reading By THURMOND (Y: 44 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1383 Lara Senate Third Reading Amend By THURMOND Set #1 (Y: 46 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1383 Lara (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Assembly - SB 1383 Lara Senate Third Reading By THURMOND (Y: 44 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-08-31 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 1383 Lara Senate Third Reading Amend By THURMOND Set #1 (Y: 46 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1383 Lara (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 395, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-09-07 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2016-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5591.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 5607.) Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page |
2016-08-31 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 30). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 24. Page 6573.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-29 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 46. Noes 22. Page 5990.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 13. Page 4105.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4009.) (May 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | May 2 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-22 | Senate | Set for hearing May 2. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 3419.) (April 6). |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2016-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. Read first time. |
2016-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 39730.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39730.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39730.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39730.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 39731 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 42652 | New Code | See Bill Text |