CA SB1494 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 451, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-19 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 451, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 97.68, 2621, 2706, 3692, 3700, and 4675 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Section 3693 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Property taxation: revenue allocations: tax-defaulted property sales.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB1494 GOV. & F (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1494 GOV.& F. Senate Third Reading By IRWIN (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1494 GOV. & F (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-18 - Assembly - SB 1494 GOV.& F. Senate Third Reading By IRWIN (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-28 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB1494 GOV. & F (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-19 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 451, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-19 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5341.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-30 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2022-08-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5927.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 20). |
2022-06-13 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2022-04-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3555.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2022-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3460.) (April 20). |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2022-04-13 | Senate | April 21 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | From printer. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Article IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 7, 2022, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement. |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 2621 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 2706 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 3692 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 3693 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 3700 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 4675 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 97.68 | Amended Code | Citation Text |