CA SB1504 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 900, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on September 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 900, Statutes of 2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 22589, 22589.1, 22589.2, and 22589.3 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to social media platforms.
Title
Cyberbullying Protection Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB1504 Stern et al. Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1504 Stern Senate Third Reading By Lowenthal (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1504 Stern et al (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-08-29 - Assembly - SB 1504 Stern Senate Third Reading By Lowenthal (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-08-15 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-07-02 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB1504 Stern et al (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 900, Statutes of 2024. | |
2024-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2024-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2024-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2024-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2024-08-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6926.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2024-08-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2024-08-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-08-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (August 15). |
2024-08-07 | Assembly | August 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2024-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-06-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-06-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2024-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2024-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4102.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2024-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3986.) (May 16). |
2024-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2024-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3728.) (April 23). |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2024-04-04 | Senate | April 16 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 18. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22589 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22589.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22589.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 22589.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |