CA SB151 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 211, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 22 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-09-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 211, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 19829.9851, 19829.9852, and 19829.9853 of the Government Code, relating to public employment and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
State employment: State Bargaining Unit 6 agreement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB151 B. & F.R. (Skinner) Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-09-08 - Assembly - SB 151 Budget and Fiscal Review Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB151 B. & F.R. (Skinner) (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-09-08 - Assembly - SB 151 Budget and Fiscal Review Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB151 B. & F.R. (Skinner) (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-22 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 211, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-09-22 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-12 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 2573.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 3109.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 61. Noes 17. Page 2953.) |
2023-09-06 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2023-08-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 502.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 8. Page 357.) |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2023-01-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 19829.9851 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19829.9852 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 19829.9853 | Amended Code | Citation Text |