CA SB260 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Read third time. Refused passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-31 - Read third time. Refused passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 38532 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
Climate Corporate Accountability Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D] | Asm. Laura Friedman [D] | Asm. Alex Lee [D] | Sen. Dave Min [D] |
Asm. Robert Rivas [D] | Asm. Mark Stone [D] | Asm. Philip Ting [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - SB 260 Wiener Senate Third Reading By Cristina Garcia (Y: 37 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB260 Wiener et al (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB260 Wiener et al (Y: 23 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-01-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. |
2022-08-16 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 21). |
2022-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | June 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 7. Page 2821.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2794.) (January 20). |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Set for hearing January 20. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | May 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-17 | Senate | May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 17. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 935.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 27. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 756.) (April 12). |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 12. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and JUD. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 26. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 38532 | New Code | See Bill Text |