CA SB366 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 13307 and 14111 of the Elections Code, relating to elections.
Title
Ballot materials: translations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-09 - Assembly - SB 366 Nguyen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB366 Nguyen (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB366 Nguyen (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 144, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-08-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2015-07-09 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2328.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1). |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 632.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 523.) (April 7). |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 7. |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 13307 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 14111 | Amended Code | Citation Text |